Unneland, Andreas Sjalg
Date of birth: 30 June 1994
Parliamentary terms
Substitute Member of Parliament no. 4 for Hordaland, 2017–2021, Socialist Left Party
Member of Parliament no. 18 for Oslo, 2021–2025, Socialist Left Party
Storting committees
2021–2025
Member, Standing Committee on Justice, 19 October 2021–30 September 2025
Parliamentary delegations
2021–2025
Substitute member, Delegation to the Nordic Council, 28 October 2021–30 September 2022
Substitute member, Delegation to the Parliamentary Assembly of the Council of Europe (PACE), 8 June 2022–30 September 2025
Last updated: 27.09.2022 10:01